CA SB555 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-19 - Stricken from Senate file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1240.055 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to eminent domain.
Title
Eminent Domain Law: conservation easement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB555 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 555 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB555 Kehoe (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-08 - Assembly - SB 555 Kehoe Senate Third Reading By CHESBRO (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB555 Kehoe (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Stricken from Senate file. | |
2009-10-11 | In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto) | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-10 | In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2389.) To enrollment. | |
2009-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3113.) To Senate. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-08-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 19.) | |
2009-08-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |
2009-06-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-15 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-06-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 1135.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-21 | Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-05-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 586.) | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |