CA SB58 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1504 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Wildlife management areas: payment of taxes and assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 363.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 14. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Read first time. |
2016-12-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12. |
2016-12-12 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |