CA SB634 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65660, 65662, 65664, and 65666 of, to amend the heading of Article 12 (commencing with Section 65660) of Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of, and to add Section 65664.5 to, the Government Code, and to add Section 17922.16 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Low Barrier Navigation Center: opportunity housing: use by right: building standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 939.) (April 26). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 797.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65664 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65664.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 65666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 17922.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |