CA SB636 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1701.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB636 Hill Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 636 Hill Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB636 Hill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - SB 636 Hill Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB636 Hill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 548, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4802.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6367.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2636.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2629.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34188 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |