CA SB7 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 54237, 54237.8, and 54238.9 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 253.1 of, to add Section 622.3 to, and to add and repeal Section 253.9 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state property and highways.
Title
Surplus nonresidential property and State Highway Route 710.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB7 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SB 7 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB7 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Portantino et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - SB 7 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 63 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB7 Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB7 Portantino et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 7. Page 3613.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1086.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 655.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54237.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54238.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 253.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 253.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 622.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |