CA SB767 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 48010 and 48011 of, and to add Section 48001 to, the Education Code, relating to kindergarten.
Title
Elementary education: kindergarten.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | January 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 18. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 935.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48011 | New Code | See Bill Text |