CA SB82 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 205.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: disabled veterans’ exemption: eligibility letters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB82 Seyarto Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 82 Seyarto Senate Third Reading By Hoover (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB82 Seyarto (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Assembly - SB 82 Seyarto Senate Third Reading By Hoover (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB82 Seyarto (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2606.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2956.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bryan. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on M. & V.A. and REV. & TAX. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1003.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 854.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 573.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and M. & V.A. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |