CA SB829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 26001 and 26153 of, and to add Section 26071 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 34010, 34011, and 34012 of, to add Section 34012.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 6414 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to cannabis, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Cannabis: donations.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB829 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 829 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Business and Professions] and [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB829 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 829 Wiener Third Reading Urgency By WOOD (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Business and Professions] and [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB829 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 6130.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 6069.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6028.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 6769.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and REV. & TAX. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4994.) (May 9). |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4723.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |