CA SB858 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.6 of, and to add Section 1203.55 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 270 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to probation.
Title
Probation: Chief Probation Officer of Nevada County.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-31 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-03 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 863.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-04-21 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1202.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1203.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 270 | Amended Code | Citation Text |