CA SB858 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8206.1, 8236, 8239, 8261, 8263.1, 8265, 8273.1, 8278.3, 8447, 8450, 8499.5, 14041.5, 14041.6, 17080, 24214, 41203.1, 41207.3, 42127, 44374.5, 47644, 48000, 49430.5, 51745.6, 51747, 51747.5, 52055.770, 56836.06, 56836.07, 56836.08, 56836.095, 56836.11, 56836.15, and 60640 of, to amend the heading of Article 4 (commencing with Section 60640) of Chapter 5 of Part 33 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 47612.1 of, to add Sections 8203.1, 44235.2, 51749.5, and 57149.6 to, to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 53010) to Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add and repeal Sections 8363.1, 42127.01, and 41841.9 of, to repeal Sections 14035 and 60640.2 of, and to repeal and add Section 8273.2 of, the Education Code, to amend Section 17581.6 of, and to add Section 17581.8 to, the Government Code, and to amend Item 6110-106-0001 of Section 2.00 of the Budget Act of 2013, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-06-15 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 2 SB858 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Assembly - SB 858 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB858 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Assembly - SB 858 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB858 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 3912.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5527.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5527.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5531.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 3132.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |