CA SB906 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67456 of the Education Code, relating to collegiate athletics.
Title
Collegiate athletics: student athlete compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (March 20). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |