CA SB950 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Set for hearing May 16.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 16 in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 5067 and 6258.5 to, and to add and repeal Section 6028.15 of, the Penal Code, relating to reentry.
Title
Reentry from incarceration: programs and benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Maria Durazo [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 5067 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6028.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6258.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |