CA SBX14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died in Conference Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died in Conference Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB4 Beall Concurrence (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB4 Beall Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER First Extraordinary Session (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Beall (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Assembly - SB4 Beall Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER First Extraordinary Session (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Beall (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died in Conference Committee. |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Senators Beall (Co-Chair), Allen, Leyva, Cannella and Gaines appointed to Conference Committee. |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Assembly Members Gomez (Co-Chair), Burke, Melendez, Mullin and Obernolte appointed to Conference Committee. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 1. Noes 39. Page 74.) Ordered to Conference Committee. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 1. Page 77.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 68.) Without reference to committee or file. Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 53.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From printer. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To print. Ordered to second reading. |