CA SBX17 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 99312.1 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 6051.8, 6201.8, and 60050 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Diesel sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 57.) (September 1). |
2015-08-28 | Senate | Set for hearing September 1. |
2015-07-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on T. & I.D. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 99312.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6051.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6201.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |