CA SCR119 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to National Fentanyl Awareness Day.
Title
National Fentanyl Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |