CA SCR121 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to International Women’s Day.
Title
International Women’s Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR121 Wahab et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |