CA SCR124 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest Day.
Title
Alzheimer's and Brain Awareness Month and The Longest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SCR 124 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR124 Corbett (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR124 Corbett (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5917.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4013.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |