CO HB1010 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the licensing of freestanding emergency departments, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freestanding Emergency Departments Licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1010 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1010 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1010 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1010, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1010, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1010 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1010, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 19-1010, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-12SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-11SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2019-02-15HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-16HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Finance
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1010
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1010_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fed0ac71e7d7b29f8725838400713e03-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fed0ac71e7d7b29f8725838400713e03-hb19-1010-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fce9c2d5b6657e708725838c0063bb08-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b12371148c56ad98725839f00519e76-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b12371148c56ad98725839f00519e76-hb19-1010-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1010vote5d0421
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9e9029a90c2c7095872583b6007329e6-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd799f89553b3271872583c4006249d4-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0568b278c5376dbc872583d7004ae12e-hb19-1010-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1010vote55dba6

Bill Comments

feedback