CO HB1030 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning updates to the 1921 law governing irrigation districts.
Title
Update 1921 Irrigation District Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |