CO HB1030 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning creating the crime of unlawful electronic sexual communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Electronic Sexual Communication

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 19-1030 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Governor Signed
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-16SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-15SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-11SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-10SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-03-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-19HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
2019-01-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1030
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1030_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/920b4db24a28d013872583be000b958f-hb19-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1030vote56ed4d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/920b4db24a28d013872583be000b958f-hb19-1030-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf0f2ae42cb06a61872583d20005509b-hb19-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1030vote5467a7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0b4f52fde2d5a5df872583d100784b6e-hb19-1030-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cf0f2ae42cb06a61872583d20005509b-hb19-1030-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0b4f52fde2d5a5df872583d100784b6e-hb19-1030-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0b4f52fde2d5a5df872583d100784b6e-hb19-1030-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1030vote5d8d31
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1030vote5d7e02

Bill Comments

feedback