CO HB1042 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the jurisdiction of the courts for certain vulnerable youth.
Title
Extend Court Jurisdiction For Vulnerable Youth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-01-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |