CO HB1042 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of a teen parent to attend driving school without a cost, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Teen Parent Driving Instruction Course
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2022-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |