CO HB1043 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning motor vehicles that operate on the roadway with fewer than four wheels in contact with the roadway, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Motorcycle And Autocycle Definitions
Sponsors
Rep. Andres Pico [R] | Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. Dennis Hisey [R] | Rep. Matt Gray [D] |
Rep. Brianna Titone [D] | Rep. Donald Valdez [D] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. Chris Holbert [R] | Sen. Larry Liston [R] | Sen. Cleave Simpson [R] |
Sen. Jim Smallwood [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 22-1043, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-04-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |