CO HB1049 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the reauthorization of the voluntary contribution on state individual income tax returns for the Habitat for Humanity of Colorado fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorize Habitat For Humanity Tax Check-off

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1049 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1049 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1049 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1049, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
2020-03-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2020-02-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1049
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1049_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1049_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1049_ren.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/23c77f0068e8cc58872584ff005b19e4-hb20-1049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/23c77f0068e8cc58872584ff005b19e4-hb20-1049-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7370ae1062a4b249872585150052df64-hb20-1049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1049vote5be226
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/60963446148ebbfd87258527007366df-hb20-1049-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f6a144b4cb89a21e872585860050d9ab-hb20-1049-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback