CO HB1051 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of businesses that obtain a permit from the public utilities commission to tow motor vehicles, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Towing Carrier Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment C), as amended. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1051, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |