CO HB1052 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local education providers' receipt of concurrent enrollment courses from a two-year institution of higher education outside of the institution's approved service area when the institution approved to serve the local education provider declines to provide concurrent enrollment courses.
Title
Exception To 2-year Higher Education Service Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2018-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |