CO HB1077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education Of Gifted Children
Title
Education Of Gifted Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-02 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-01 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2011-01-31 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-28 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-27 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-24 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |