CO HB1081 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Carrier Safety Fund
Title
Motor Carrier Safety Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 4-0, with one member excused. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 4-0 with 1 excused. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 4-0 with 1 excused. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1081 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-02-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-02-21 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-23 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |