CO HB1087 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Membership Human Services Allocation Committees
Title
Membership Human Services Allocation Committees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1087 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |