CO HB1095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 8:00 am in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 8:00 am in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection for minor workers in the "Colorado Youth Employment Opportunity Act of 1971", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Increasing Protections for Minor Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1095, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-15 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |