CO HB1106 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to secure firearms to prevent use by persons not lawfully permitted to possess firearms.
Title
Safe Storage Of Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1106 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.055) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.054) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.053) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.052) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.048) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.046) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.045) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.043) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.040) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.033) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.032) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.029) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 32 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1106 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1106 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.055) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.054) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.053) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.052) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.048) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.046) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.045) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.043) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.040) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.036) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.033) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.032) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.029) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.028) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.025) (Y: 26 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.024) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.006) (Y: 25 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.003) (Y: 32 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1106 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |