CO HB1113 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mental health educational resources, and, in connection therewith, making enhancements to the safe2tell program.
Title
Mental Health Educational Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1113 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1113 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1113, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Governor Signed | |
2020-07-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-07-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-06-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Appropriations |