CO HB1120 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal Registration Of Sprinkler Fitters
Title
Repeal Registration Of Sprinkler Fitters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - pi (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - pi (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - pi (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - pi (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - pi (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1120 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1120, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology + Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-25 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-08 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development + Appropriations |