CO HB1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rabies Vaccinations For Dogs & Cats
Title
Rabies Vaccinations For Dogs & Cats
Sponsors
Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 16-1120 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1120, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |