CO HB1133 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Amend Equity Purchaser Prov
Title
Foreclosure Amend Equity Purchaser Prov
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 10-1133, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-04-30 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-29 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-22 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2010-03-31 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-29 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-19 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-26 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-02-23 | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-22 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2010 | |
2010-02-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-08 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |