CO HB1134 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
HOA Information Resource Ctr Annual Registration
Title
HOA Information Resource Ctr Annual Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Morgan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1134 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1134 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1134 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2013-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-09 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |