CO HB1145 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a special license plate to support pollinators, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Support Pollinator Special License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1145 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-22 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2021-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance |