CO HB1150 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PERA Seven Year Highest Average Salary Calculation
Title
PERA Seven Year Highest Average Salary Calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone House Bill 12-1150 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone House Bill 12-1150 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone House Bill 12-1150 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.005 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reverse the previous roll call vote and postpone House Bill 12-1150 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-03-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | |
2012-03-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-12 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-09 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-01 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2012-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |