CO HB1153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change Due Date For State Board Of Parole Report
Title
Change Due Date For State Board Of Parole Report
Sponsors
Rep. Jovan Melton [D] | Sen. John Cooke [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1153 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1153 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1153 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 31 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1153 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2016-03-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |