CO HB1174 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-7)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning homeowner's insurance, and, in connection therewith, requiring certain reports related to the cost of reconstructing a home, increasing the notice requirement before an insurer can cancel or refuse to renew a homeowner's insurance policy, creating guaranteed replacement cost coverage in homeowner's insurance, and making an appropriation.
Title
Homeowner's Insurance Underinsurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 23-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |