CO HB1205 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the pre-1987 net operating loss deduction for individuals, estates, and trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pre-1987 Net Operating Loss Deduction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1205 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1205 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-02SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-20HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-19HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1205
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1205_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c1f13f4bb094c1118725850c0077f789-hb20-1205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1205vote5a3f68
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0e6e8f28a7e5887e8725851f00710cbc-hb20-1205-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1205vote5a95b6

Bill Comments

feedback