CO HB1217 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a temporary income tax credit for employers that make contributions to 529 qualified state tuition program accounts owned by their employees, and, in connection therewith, enacting the "Working Families College Savings Act".
Title
Income Tax Credit For Employer 529 Contributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1217, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1217 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/07/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-12 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Finance |