CO HB1234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxicab Vehicle License Plates
Title
Taxicab Vehicle License Plates
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Spence [R] | Rep. Glenn Vaad [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-15 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Lay Over Daily | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-16 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |