CO HB1263 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit Income Tax Benefit For Comp Paid
Title
Limit Income Tax Benefit For Comp Paid
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Boyd [D] | Rep. John Pommer [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Move to postpone House Bill 10-1263 indefinitely (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |