CO HB1270 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that firearm owners maintain liability insurance, and, in connection therewith, requiring insurers to make coverage available in homeowners and renters insurance policies for damages resulting from accidental or unintentional discharge of a firearm.
Title
Firearm Liability Insurance Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1270, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/02/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/01/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/30/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |