CO HB1288 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Administration Of IT Projects In State Gov
Title
Administration Of IT Projects In State Gov
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1288 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1288 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1288 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment I) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1288, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology | |
2012-02-27 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-24 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |