CO HB1291 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sunrise review of a proposed regulation of an unregulated professional or occupational group.
Title
Sunrise Review Professions Occupations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1291 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |