CO HB1293 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recall Elections Modify Procedures & Deadlines
Title
Recall Elections Modify Procedures & Deadlines
Sponsors
Sen. Keith King [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1293 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-18 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2012-04-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-09 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-05 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-29 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |