CO HB1312 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to sales tax statutes in order to address certain defects and anachronisms.
Title
Modifications To Sales Tax Statutes To Address Defects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1312 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1312 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1312 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1312 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-07 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |