CO HB1326 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an expansion of an individual's ability to practice an occupation in Colorado through creation of an occupational credential portability program.
Title
Create Occupational Credential Portability Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1326 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1326 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1326, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2020-05-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-03-11 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |